Global patent index - EP 1049941 A1

EP 1049941 A1 2000-11-08 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR LOCATING DATA CARRIERS

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR LOCATING DATA CARRIERS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALISIERUNG VON DATENTRÄGERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LOCALISER DES SUPPORTS DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1049941 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99944452 A

Priority

  • DE 19838902 A
  • EP 9906107 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19838902A1] The invention comprises an arrangement with which mobile objects can be located in particular areas. The mobile objects for locating, e.g., persons or inanimate objects, are provided with a data carrier which determines the absolute position using a position-determining system such as e.g., GPS. For many applications, it is not always necessary to know the absolute position of the object. Information about the area in which the object is located is usually sufficient. In order to optimise the exchanging of data between the application that requires the location of the data carrier and the object itself, the absolute position of the objects is transmitted to an information unit when the data carrier is initialised. Said information unit translates the co-ordinates using a digitised map or a plan divided into areas so that the object can be allocated to a corresponding area. This data is stored in the information unit. The boundaries of the area in which the object is located are transmitted to the data carrier and if the object changes its position, the data carrier itself can determine whether the object has left an area. If the current position of the data carrier no longer matches the area information, the data carrier reports its position to the information unit again. If an application requests the position of a data carrier, the information unit transmits the data carrier area information that has been stored to the application. This results in optimal communications between the applications and the data carriers. The position of the data carrier can be established even when the data carrier cannot be reached momentarily.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 5/02; G01S 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 5/00 (2006.01); G01S 19/14 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 5/0027 (2013.01); G01S 19/14 (2013.01); G01S 2205/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0013035A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19838902 A1 20000302; CA 2307504 A1 20000309; EP 1049941 A1 20001108; JP 2002523785 A 20020730; WO 0013035 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061121

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE