Global Patent Index - EP 1052725 A1

EP 1052725 A1 2000-11-15 - Method of manufacturing a microwave reflective surface

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a microwave reflective surface

Title (de)

Verfahren und Herstellung für eine elektromagnetische wellen reflektierende Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Surface réfléchissant les ondes électromagnétiques et procédé pour sa réalisation

Publication

EP 1052725 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401204 A

Priority

FR 9905901 A

Abstract (en)

The coated and woven structure provides a sufficiently rigid structure with a very lightweight design. The rigid reflecting surface for electromagnetic waves consists of interlaced electrical conductors (2,3) which are formed superficially of a stable metallic diffusion alloy. This ensures the solid fastening together of the structure with the conductors held together, and also the rigidity of the resultant surface. The electrical conductors may either be woven together, or knitted together in order to form this mesh. The transverse dimension of the conductors in at least one direction is less than 20 microns. The mesh may be supported on an insulating reinforcing layer, which may comprise a polymerised composite fibre matrix. The thickness of the metal surface coating forming the conductors may be between 10 Angstroms and 20 microns.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une surface rigide réfléchissant les ondes électromagnétiques, notamment pour réflecteur d'antenne, blindage électromagnétique et guide d'ondes. Selon l'invention, cette surface est constituée d'un entrelacs (7) de fils électriquement conducteurs (2, 3) qui sont constitués superficiellement d'un alliage métallique stable de diffusion assurant la solidarisation desdits fils entre eux et la rigidité de ladite surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 9/00 (2006.01); H01Q 15/14 (2006.01); H01Q 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/14 (2013.01); H01Q 15/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052725 A1 20001115; EP 1052725 B1 20060830; CA 2308787 A1 20001110; CA 2308787 C 20080318; DE 60030354 D1 20061012; DE 60030354 T2 20071031; ES 2269076 T3 20070401; FR 2793608 A1 20001117; FR 2793608 B1 20010914; JP 2000349540 A 20001215; US 6348901 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269076 T3

2006-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-10-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASTRIUM SAS

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030354 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS SPACE TRANSPORTATION SAS

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS SPACE TRANSPORTATION SA

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS LAUNCH VEHICLES

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI