Global Patent Index - EP 1054215 A1

EP 1054215 A1 2000-11-22 - Boiler with combustion control apparatus

Title (en)

Boiler with combustion control apparatus

Title (de)

Heizkessel mit einer Verbrennungssteuereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Chaudière avec un dispositif de commande de combustion

Publication

EP 1054215 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99108671 A

Priority

EP 99108671 A

Abstract (en)

A boiler (100) with combustion control apparatus having a phototransistor (30) for precisely detecting a combustion status of the boiler is disclosed. The boiler (100) with the combustion control has a burner for generating a flame by means of a mixing fuel containing combustion gas and air, and the phototransistor (30) for detecting a light wavelength of the flame. A combustion chamber cover (20) is installed between the burner and the phototransistor (30). A heat-resistant window (25) is installed on the combustion chamber cover (20) in a straight line with the flame (F) and the phototransistor (30) so that the heat-resistant window (25) can prevent heat of the flame from transmitting into the phototransistor (30) while normally sensing the light of the flame (F). A control part is installed in the combustion control apparatus of the boiler in order to control the amount of air flowing into the burner according to output signal of the phototransistor (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/082 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 3613062 A 19711012 - BLOICE JOHN A
  • [A] DE 2229178 A1 19740103 - KOERTING OEL GASFEUERUNG
  • [A] US 5037291 A 19910806 - CLARK DANIEL R [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 300 (M - 433) 27 November 1985 (1985-11-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 282 (P - 500) 25 September 1986 (1986-09-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 072 (M - 013) 27 May 1980 (1980-05-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 316 (M - 438) 12 December 1985 (1985-12-12)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054215 A1 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020416

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI