Global Patent Index - EP 1056553 A1

EP 1056553 A1 2000-12-06 - ROLLING MILL WITH WORKING ROLLERS AND MULTIPART SUPPORT ROLLERS

Title (en)

ROLLING MILL WITH WORKING ROLLERS AND MULTIPART SUPPORT ROLLERS

Title (de)

WALZWERK MIT ARBEITSWALZEN UND MEHRTEILIGEN STÜTZWALZEN

Title (fr)

LAMINOIR COMPRENANT DES CYLINDRES DE TRAVAIL ET DES CYLINDRES D'APPUI EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES

Publication

EP 1056553 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916753 A

Priority

  • DE 9900499 W
  • DE 19807601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807601C1] The invention relates to a rolling mill with working rollers and multipart support rollers, comprising a base body with roller bearings arranged next to each other in the longitudinal direction of said body. The outer rings of the bearings rotationally support a sleeve encompassing the roller bearings. The inner surface of said sleeve lies on the outer surface of the outer rings of the roller bearings. The outer surface of the sleeve forms the roll barrel of the support roller. The base body has lengthwise three roller bearings, the central roller bearing being embodied as a tapered roller bearing. The two external roller bearings are embodied as cylindrical roller bearings (5). An eccentric bushing (7) that can be power-driven rotationally around the longitudinal axis (3) of the base body is arranged between the cylindrical roller bearings (5) and the base body (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/14; B21B 27/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 29/00 (2006.01); B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 27/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2013.01); B21B 27/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941025A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807601 C1 19990812; AT 217216 T 20020515; AU 3515099 A 19990830; EP 1056553 A1 20001206; EP 1056553 B1 20020508; ES 2173735 T3 20021016; JP 2002502705 A 20020129; JP 4331893 B2 20090916; US 6286355 B1 20010911; WO 9941025 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59901398

2015-09-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901398

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173735 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901398 20020613

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217216 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE