Global patent index - EP 1056558 A1

EP 1056558 A1 2000-12-06 - DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS HORIZONTAL CASTING OF PROFILED MEMBERS, IN PARTICULAR OF METAL STRIPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE CONTINUOUS HORIZONTAL CASTING OF PROFILED MEMBERS, IN PARTICULAR OF METAL STRIPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HORIZONTALEN STRANGGIESSEN VON PROFILEN, INSBESONDERE VON METALLBÄNDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COULEE CONTINUE HORIZONTALE DE PROFILES, NOTAMMENT DE BANDES METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 1056558 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904608 A

Priority

  • AT 9900042 W
  • AT 28498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942235A1] The present invention relates to a device for the continuous horizontal casting of profiled members, in particular of metal strips, wherein said device comprises a collecting vessel for the metal melt, preferably a holding furnace as well as a mould (2) connected to the collecting vessel through a stamping frame (7). The mould has a shaping casting slot (3) comprising a fire-proof coating (4) which cannot be impregnated with the metal melt. This device also includes a swing drive mechanism (18) for the mould (2) in the casting direction. In order to provide advantageous structural conditions, the mould (2) is mounted on a sliding guide (9) which extends in the casting direction and which is associated with the collecting vessel, while the swing drive mechanism (18) rests partly on the collecting vessel and partly on the mould (2). A non-woven material (13) is further provided between the collecting vessel and the mould (2), wherein said non-woven material is prestressed under a minimal pressure depending on the hydraulic pressure of the metal melt. The non-woven material is made of fibres that cannot be impregnated with the metal melt and is used as a sealing member relative to said metal melt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/045 (2006.01); B22D 11/047 (2006.01); B22D 11/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/045 (2013.01); B22D 11/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942235A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942235 A1 19990826; AT 227618 T 20021115; AT 407350 B 20010226; AT A28498 A 20000715; DE 59903396 D1 20021219; EP 1056558 A1 20001206; EP 1056558 B1 20021113; JP 2002503555 A 20020205; US 6554055 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070217

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-02-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 227618

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010820

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI