Global Patent Index - EP 1057317 A2

EP 1057317 A2 2000-12-06 - CONTROLLING NAVIGATION PATHS OF A SPEECH-RECOGNITION PROCESS

Title (en)

CONTROLLING NAVIGATION PATHS OF A SPEECH-RECOGNITION PROCESS

Title (de)

VERWALTUNG VON NAVIGATIONSPFADEN IN EINEM SPRACHERKENNUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

CONTROLE DES TRAJETS DE NAVIGATION D'UN PROCESSUS DE RECONNAISSANCE DE LA PAROLE

Publication

EP 1057317 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99911100 A

Priority

  • US 9904747 W
  • US 3226698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944345A2] A method and computer program for controlling navigation paths in a speech-recognition process in which prompts are provided to a user, and actions are taken based on comparison of the user's spoken responses to stored speech elements. The method includes organizing the prompts, actions, and speech elements in a hierarchy of nodes that include group nodes and terminal nodes, and displaying the nodes in a hierarchical list that indicates navigation paths in the speech-recognition process. A user can alter the navigation paths in the speech-recognition process by editing the position of the nodes in the hierarchical list. The speech-recognition process may be a call routing process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/50; G10L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/26 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01); H04M 3/50 (2006.01); G10L 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/493 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2013.01); G10L 15/22 (2013.01); H04M 2201/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944345A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944345 A2 19990902; WO 9944345 A3 19991021; AU 2982699 A 19990915; EP 1057317 A2 20001206; JP 2002505556 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040608

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCANSOFT, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PONDSACK, MARK, S.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GABRYS, GARETH, L.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAIT, RAJA, K.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GROSSMAN, PETER

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WOMER, MATTHEW, D.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLINS, TIM, J.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAZNICKI, LOIS, W.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BALLESTAS, DIANE, P.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PONDSACK, MARK, S.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GABRYS, GARETH, L.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAIT, RAJA, K.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GROSSMAN, PETER

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WOMER, MATTHEW, D.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLINS, TIM, J.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAZNICKI, LOIS, W.

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BALLESTAS, DIANE, P.

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT