Global Patent Index - EP 1057372 A1

EP 1057372 A1 2000-12-06 - DIMMABLE ELECTRONIC BALLAST WITH SINGLE STAGE FEEDBACK INVERTER

Title (en)

DIMMABLE ELECTRONIC BALLAST WITH SINGLE STAGE FEEDBACK INVERTER

Title (de)

DIMMBARES VORSCHALTGERÄT MIT EINSTUFIGER RÜCKKOPPELUNG

Title (fr)

BALLAST ELECTRONIQUE POUR INTENSITE VARIABLE COMPORTANT UN SEUL ETAGE DE CONVERTISSEUR A REACTION

Publication

EP 1057372 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965515 A

Priority

  • EP 9910195 W
  • US 22240598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0040058A1] A high frequency dimmable electronic ballast comprising a single stage feedback inverter and power factor controller which regulates the power delivered to a load by the inverter at low dim levels such that sufficient lamp crest factor is maintained for load changes from 100 % to 10 %. Sufficient load current crest factors are obtained for variable load (dimming) by operating the ballast in a closed loop configuration, whereby the average value of the load current and/or power is measured and regulated. In one aspect of the present invention, an electronic ballast comprises a single stage feedback inverter for supplying high frequency power to a load in response to driving signals; current sensing means for sensing current flowing in the load due to the supplied load power; voltage detection means for detecting a peak voltage of said load due to the supplied load power; dimming means for generating an illumination signal corresponding to a desired power level of the load; and a controller connected to the single stage feedback inverter and dimming means, for generating the driving signals to cause the inverter to generate the desired power level to the load, whereby the controller processes the sensed load current and the detected peak load voltage to maintain a sufficient lamp crest factor at the desired load power level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 41/28 (2006.01); H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2828 (2013.01); H05B 41/28 (2013.01); H05B 41/2986 (2013.01); H05B 41/3925 (2013.01); Y02B 20/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040058A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0040058 A1 20000706; CN 1291415 A 20010411; EP 1057372 A1 20001206; JP 2003529891 A 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE