Global Patent Index - EP 1058228 A2

EP 1058228 A2 2000-12-06 - Interconnection between a computer and a display

Title (en)

Interconnection between a computer and a display

Title (de)

Verbindung zwischen Computer und Anzeigegerät

Title (fr)

Interconnexion entre ordinateur et dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1058228 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112041 A

Priority

JP 15583699 A

Abstract (en)

A display device includes video-signal-processor for receiving an input-video-signal and pixel-converting-circuit for converting a pixel of an output signal from the video signal processor so that display device can display the input video signal as an appropriate video on a pixel-displaying device, where the display device receives pixel-format-data of the input video signal through a control bus independent of the input video signal. A computer system includes a computer having video-signal-outputting-section for outputting a video signal to display device, video-signal-data-outputting-section for outputting format data of the video signal output from section, and a control bus for transmitting the format data of the input video signal as well as a request of transferring the format data from the display device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20; G06F 3/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/153 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/006 (2013.01); G09G 5/005 (2013.01); G09G 2370/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1058228 A2 20001206; EP 1058228 A3 20050727; CN 1276589 A 20001213; JP 2000347637 A 20001215; KR 100386773 B1 20030609; KR 20010014994 A 20010226; MY 122646 A 20060429; TW 469738 B 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160521

2009-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090811

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI