Global Patent Index - EP 1059122 A1

EP 1059122 A1 2000-12-13 - A spray device with flat fan nozzle

Title (en)

A spray device with flat fan nozzle

Title (de)

Sprühvorrichtung mit einer Flachstrahldüse

Title (fr)

Appareil de pulvérisation comprenant une buse à jet plat

Publication

EP 1059122 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870117 A

Priority

EP 99870117 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention related to a portable device for spraying a liquid at low pressure, said device comprising a spray arm, and characterized in that the spray arm comprises at least one flat fan spray nozzle. Preferably, the liquid is a cleaning composition for treatment of carpets and other large fabric coverings, more preferably, a composition comprising surfactants. Also preferably, the portable device is electrically driven, and/or the spray arm is extendible and/or detachable form the device's main unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 9/08; A47L 11/34; B05B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/34 (2006.01); B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B05B 9/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4088 (2013.01); A47L 11/34 (2013.01); B05B 1/04 (2013.01); B05B 9/0861 (2013.01); C11D 3/0031 (2013.01); C11D 17/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059122 A1 20001213; AU 5467600 A 20001228; CA 2369719 A1 20001214; CA 2369719 C 20090414; CN 1354695 A 20020619; WO 0074862 A1 20001214

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070424

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061211

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI