Global Patent Index - EP 1059129 A2

EP 1059129 A2 2000-12-13 - Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack, forming tool used therein and two chamber pressure pack produced therewith

Title (en)

Method and device for producing a two chamber pressure pack, forming tool used therein and two chamber pressure pack produced therewith

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Zweikammerdruckpackung, Bearbeitungswerkzeug zur Verwendung darin sowie damit herstellbare Zweikammerdruckpackung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la fabrication d' une bombe à aérosol comportant deux chambres, outil de formage utilisé dans cette méthode et ce dispositif et bombe à aérosol ainsi fabriquée

Publication

EP 1059129 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110460 A

Priority

  • DE 19926496 A
  • DE 19932680 A

Abstract (en)

The twin-chamber pressure package, where one chamber holds the filled contents and the other chamber has the pressurized propellant, has a sealed beaded edge between the inner and outer containers (1,2). The inner container (2) has nominal distortion zones (25) to give a targeted collapse and prevent the formation of sharp edges or folds. The nominal distortion zones (25) are formed by the insertion of a tool spindle (11) into the inner container (2) to develop a pressure difference between its interior (7) and the propellant zone (8) and take up the contour shape of the tool spindle (11) by pressure or suction.

Abstract (de)

Um Leckagen bei einer aus einem Außenbehälter (1) und einem Innenbehälter (2) gebildeten Zweikammerdruckpackung (27) mit konisch sich verjüngendem Mundstück (28) und gemeinsam umbördelten Innen- und Außenbehälter (1, 2) zu vermeiden, werden ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Zweikammerdruckpackung (27), eine damit herstellbare Zweikammerdruckpackung sowie darin verwendbare Vorrichtungen vorgeschlagen, bei bzw. mit denen der bereits in den Außenbehälter (1) eingebrachte Innenbehälter (2) mit Sollverformungszonen (25) versehen wird, die für ein gezielt ablaufendes Verknautschen des Innenbehälters (2) die Ausbildung von scharfen Kanten oder Falten reduzieren. Das Einbringen der Sollverformungszonen (25) erfolgt vorzugsweise über Einführen eines Werkzeugdorns (11) in den Innenbehälter (2) und Beaufschlagung des Innenbehälters (2) mit einer Druckdifferenz zwischen dessen Innenraum (7) und dem Treibmittelraum (8), so daß der bleibend deformierbare Innenbehälter (2) die Kontur des Werkzeugdoms (11) annehmend an letzteren gepreßt oder gesogen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 51/24; B21D 51/26; B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 15/03 (2006.01); B21D 51/24 (2006.01); B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/62 (2013.01); B21D 15/03 (2013.01); B21D 51/24 (2013.01); B21D 51/2646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059129 A2 20001213; EP 1059129 A3 20010926

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038528

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-07-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A TWO CHAMBER PRESSURE PACK AND FORMING TOOL USED THEREIN

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI