Global Patent Index - EP 1060046 A1

EP 1060046 A1 2000-12-20 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EARLY DETECTION OF A RUPTURE IN A CONTINUOS CASTING PLANT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EARLY DETECTION OF A RUPTURE IN A CONTINUOS CASTING PLANT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHBRUCHFRÜHERKENNUNG IN EINER STRANGGUSSANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR IDENTIFIER DE MANIERE PRECOCE UNE RUPTURE DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1060046 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916748 A

Priority

  • DE 9900445 W
  • DE 19808998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808998A1] The invention relates to a method for early detection of a rupture in a continuos casting plant, wherein a liquid metal in cast into a chill (2) and is withdrawn from the chill (2) in the form of a billet (1), whereby the temperature of the chill (2) is measured and said temperature is simultaneously displayed together with the point and the duration of measurement of said temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944772A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808998 A1 19990909; DE 19808998 B4 20071206; AT 219978 T 20020715; EP 1060046 A1 20001220; EP 1060046 B1 20020703; US 2003150584 A1 20030814; WO 9944772 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-10-12 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901923 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219978 T 20020715

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ADAMY, JUERGEN

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENEMUND, MARTIN

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STUERMER, UWE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB