Global Patent Index - EP 1060802 A1

EP 1060802 A1 2000-12-20 - PIERCING MILL

Title (en)

PIERCING MILL

Title (de)

LOCHWALZWERK

Title (fr)

LAMINOIR PERCEUR

Publication

EP 1060802 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98947808 A

Priority

  • JP 9804571 W
  • JP 27864797 A

Abstract (en)

The thus-far adopted premise for drive unit arrangement in a conventional piercing mill is reconsidered in an effort to improve the arrangement of drive unit components. According to the present invention, a piercing mill for the manufacture of seamless steel tube comprises a pair of piercing rolls 1 disposed opposite each other with respect to a pass line along which a tube stock 3 moves while being rolled, a plug disposed along the pass line so as to be positioned between the piercing rolls, and drive units 4 which impart a rotative drive force to the piercing rolls, the drive units 4 each comprising a spindle 5, a reduction mechanism 6, and a main motor 7, the main motor 7 being disposed on the piercing roll side relative to the reduction mechanism 6 and in parallel with the spindle 5. The drive units axe preferably disposed on an outlet side of the piercing mill. According to the piercing mill of the present invention, since the space occupied by the drive units can be diminished, the arrangement of components of the overall set of production equipment can be made compact. Further, when a continuous tube manufacturing facility is to be realized, an adjacent mill can be disposed in proximity to the piercing mill and thus the overall layout can be optimized. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 19/04 (2013.01); B21B 35/06 (2013.01); B21B 35/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919089 A1 19990422; EP 1060802 A1 20001220; EP 1060802 A4 20090422; EP 1060802 B1 20120208; JP 3239894 B2 20011217

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 69842592

- Effective date: 20120216

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 69842592

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842592

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842592

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-03-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842592

- Effective date: 20121109

2013-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121109

2012-04-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842592

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091006

2009-04-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090319

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE