Global Patent Index - EP 1063036 A1

EP 1063036 A1 2000-12-27 - Method and equipment for removing and/or cutting off bobs when die-casting

Title (en)

Method and equipment for removing and/or cutting off bobs when die-casting

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen und/oder Abschneiden von Anschnitten beim Druckgiessen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour enlever et/ou decouper des attaques pendant la coulée en coquille

Publication

EP 1063036 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830392 A

Priority

EP 99830392 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns equipment for removing the bobs (runners, gates)(16,17) from die-cast pieces (11). It is made up of hubs (18,19) mounted crossways in the parts or half dies (12a,12b) of the die, facing the bobs at the height of the attachment zones (16',17') of the latter to the piece. The hubs are moved to push away and detach the feedheads after the piece has been moulded and before the die is opened to lift off the said piece. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/2076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 976942 C 19640820 - NAT LEAD CO
  • [A] US 4799534 A 19890124 - UENO TOYOAKI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 299 (M - 1274) 2 July 1992 (1992-07-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 294 (M - 431) 20 November 1985 (1985-11-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 235 (M - 415) 21 September 1985 (1985-09-21)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 396 (M - 1644) 25 July 1994 (1994-07-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1063036 A1 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040609

2002-02-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIANCHI, MICHELA

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIANCHI, MICHELA

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-04 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010621;SI PAYMENT 20010621

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Inventor name: BIANCHI, CARLO

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVID, GRAZIANO

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIANCHI, CARLO

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI