Global patent index - EP 1064658 A1

EP 1064658 A1 2001-01-03 - SHEATH

Title (en)

SHEATH

Title (de)

UMMANTELUNG

Title (fr)

GAINE DE CABLE

Publication

EP 1064658 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924659 A

Priority

  • DE 9900818 W
  • DE 19812314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812314A1] A sheath (9) which can be marked by radiation with photons, in particular laser radiation, in which the sheath (9) having an inner space separated from an outer space, an inner space-side first layer (10) and an outer space-side second layer (11), is characterised by the first layer (10) consisting of a first material and contains a first pigment fraction. The second layer (11) which consists of a second material contains a smaller second fraction of the pigment, at least within a zone serving as a marking surface, in which the second fraction of the pigment is sufficient for the radiation of the zone with photons, to cause a change in colour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/36 (2006.01); H01B 13/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/361 (2013.01); H01B 13/348 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1393 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812314 A1 19990923; EP 1064658 A1 20010103; EP 1064658 B1 20030528; US 6846536 B1 20050125; WO 9948114 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CCS TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI