Global Patent Index - EP 1068933 A2

EP 1068933 A2 2001-01-17 - Disassembling device for expansion anchoring dowel

Title (en)

Disassembling device for expansion anchoring dowel

Title (de)

Demontagevorrichtung für formschlüssig verankernden Dübel

Title (fr)

Cheville d'ancrage expansif

Publication

EP 1068933 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810586 A

Priority

DE 19932863 A

Abstract (en)

A sleeve-shaped support part (2) has an axially protruding bolt-extension (4) on its one end forming a support shoulder (3). The bolt extension has load-application elements (5) cooperating with load-application elements on the rear end of the plug's sleeve. An internally threaded bore-hole (6) extends through the bolt-extension and holds an externally threaded (8) shaft (7) which is axially rotated in relation to the support part. The shaft has two lengthwise ends (9,10) with identical coupling elements (11) for an adapter piece (12). One lengthwise section (13) of the adapter piece has a connection (14) , with the opposite lengthwise end acting as insertion end (15) for a tool, especially rotary drill

Abstract (de)

Eine Demontagevorrichtung Hinterschnittanker besitzt ein hülsenförmiges Abstützteil (2), das an seinem einen, eine Abstützschulter (3) bildenden Ende einen axial abragenden Riegelfortsatz (4) aufweist, der mit Lastangriffsmitteln (5) ausgestattet ist. Die Lastangriffsmittel (5) sind mit korrespondierend ausgebildeten Lastangriffsmitteln am rückwärtigen Ende der Hülse des Dübels in eine zugbelastbare Wirkverbindung bringbar. Das Abstützteil (2) besitzt eine wenigstens bereichsweise mit einem Innengewinde versehene Durchgangsbohrung (6), die sich durch den Riegelfortsatz (4) erstreckt und zur Aufnahme einer mit einem Aussengewinde (8) versehenen Welle (7) dient, die durch Rotation relativ zum Abstützteil (2) axial verstellbar ist. Die Welle (7) besitzt zwei Längsenden (9, 10) mit identisch ausgebildeten Kupplungselementen (11) für ein Adapterstück (12), dessen einer Längsabschnitt (13) einen Aussendurchmesser (a) aufweist, der kleiner ist als der Innendurchmesser (i) der Durchgangsbohrung (6) des Abstützteils (2) und am freien Ende mit einem auf die Kupplungselemente (11) der Welle (7) abgestimmten Anschlussteil (14) ausgestattet ist. Das gegenüberliegende Längsende des Adapterstücks (12) ist als Einsteckende (15) für die Werkzeugaufnahme einer Handwerkzeugmaschine, insbesondere einer Drehbohrmaschine, ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2006.01); B25B 31/00 (2006.01); F16B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4702654 A 19871027 - FRISCHMANN ALBERT [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068933 A2 20010117; EP 1068933 A3 20020904; EP 1068933 B1 20080409; CN 1151013 C 20040526; CN 1280899 A 20010124; DE 19932863 A1 20010118; DE 50015084 D1 20080521; JP 2001081773 A 20010327; JP 4531940 B2 20100825

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015084 P 20080521

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI