Global Patent Index - EP 1069240 A1

EP 1069240 A1 2001-01-17 - Tamping process

Title (en)

Tamping process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Gleisstopfen

Title (fr)

Procédé de bourrage

Publication

EP 1069240 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114220 A

Priority

DE 19932793 A

Abstract (en)

The mobile rail track maintenance machine has a number of driven packing tools (14) positioned in opposition on either side of each track rail (4), for transverse displacement relative to the latter and provided with picks (16), for penetrating the track ballast on either side of each rail sleeper (1). The packing pressure exerted on the picks is reduced with increased distance of the packing tools from the track rails.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine fahrbare Gleisstopfmaschine mit mehreren über Antriebe beistellbaren und vibrierbaren Stopfwerkzeugen (14) angegeben, wobei das Stopfwerkzeug auf beiden Seiten der jeweiligen Schwelle einander gegenüberliegend Stopfpickel (16) aufweist, die bei Aktivierung in den Schotter des Gleisunterbaus eintauchen und den Schotter unter die Schwelle stopfen. Die Stopfwerkzeuge sind quer zu den Schienen verfahrbar, und die Stopfpickel arbeiten mit zunehmendem Abstand der Stopfwerkzeuge von den Schienen mit vermindertem Stopfdruck. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0455179 A2 19911106 - PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069240 A1 20010117; EP 1069240 B1 20070530; AT 363563 T 20070615; DE 19932793 A1 20010201; DE 19932793 C2 20011108; DE 50014360 D1 20070712

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140703

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 363563 T

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130703

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014360 P 20070712

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TAMPING PROCESS

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHA

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI