Global Patent Index - EP 1069285 A3

EP 1069285 A3 2001-05-02 - Electromagnetic actuating device for operating a gas exchange valve with stacking springs

Title (en)

Electromagnetic actuating device for operating a gas exchange valve with stacking springs

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch betätigbare Stellvorrichtung zur Betätigung eines Gaswechselventils mit Federschachtelung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électromagnétique pour actionner une soupape de gaz avec des ressorts concentriquement emboîtés

Publication

EP 1069285 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00123025 A

Priority

  • DE 9420463 U
  • EP 95942673 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5813653A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/04970 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 4, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 4, 1996 PCT Filed Dec. 15, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/19643 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 27, 1996An electromagnetic actuator operating a cylinder valve of an internal-combustion engine includes first and second spaced electromagnets having pole faces oriented toward one another; an armature arranged for reciprocating motion between the pole faces; and a connecting rod having a first rod part being in an abutting contact with a first side of the armature and being a component separate therefrom. The abutting contact is such as to prevent a torque transmission between the first rod part and the armature. The connecting rod has a second rod part which is rigidly affixed to a second side of the armature and extending towards the cylinder valve. There are further provided a first spring situated adjacent the first electromagnet externally thereof and arranged for urging the first rod part into the abutting contact with the armature for urging the armature away from the first pole face towards the second pole face; and a second spring situated adjacent the second electromagnet externally thereof and arranged for urging the armature away from the second pole face towards the first pole face. The first and second springs act oppositely such that in a de-energized state of the first and second electromagnets the armature is held by the first and second springs in an intermediate position between the pole faces of the first and second electromagnets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5813653 A 19980929; DE 19581518 D2 19970227; DE 9420463 U1 19960425; EP 0748416 A1 19961218; EP 0748416 B1 20020417; EP 1069285 A2 20010117; EP 1069285 A3 20010502; EP 1069285 B1 20030219; WO 9619643 A1 19960627

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510563 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0748416 P

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 748416

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT