Global Patent Index - EP 1077283 A2

EP 1077283 A2 2001-02-21 - Press section

Title (en)

Press section

Title (de)

Pressenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de presse

Publication

EP 1077283 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115704 A

Priority

DE 19938979 A

Abstract (en)

The press section of a machine for the prodn. and/or finishing of a fiber web has, in the direction of web travel (10), an initial pair of rollers higher than the following rollers. The press line (7) through the axes (6) of the leading press rollers (4,5) is aligned against the vertical (8), in the direction (10) of web travel, so that the fiber web (1) travels through the roller press gap (2) horizontally or pref. at a downwards angle. The pitch angle (9) of the press line (7) is angled against the vertical (8) by 10-20 degrees . At least one press blanket (3) moves through the first roller press gap (2) together with the fiber web (1) and on both sides of it. Of the rollers (4,5) where the press blanket (3) passes around them, at least some rollers and pref. all of them (4,5) have mantle surfaces which are grooved and/or carry blind drillings. The rollers (4,5) have catch units (12) to take and dispose of water spun off the rollers and blankets.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pressenpartie einer Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Veredelung einer Faserstoffbahn (1), insbesondere eine Papier-, Karton-oder Tissuebahn, bestehend aus zumindest zwei, von jeweils einem Walzenpaar gebildeten Preßspalten (2), wobei neben der Faserstoffbahn (1) wenigstens jeweils ein endlos umlaufender Preßfilz (3) zur Aufnahme des ausgepreßten Wassers durch die Preßspalte (2) geführt und zumindest die jeweils untere Presswalze (4) der Walzenpaare zylindrisch und die jeweils obere Presswalze (5) als Schuhpresswalze mit konkaver Pressfläche zur Bildung eines verlängerten Preßspaltes (2) ausgebildet ist. Davon ausgehend soll die Vorumschlingung der unteren Presswalzen mit möglichst geringem Aufwand vergrößert werden. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, dass das in Bahnlaufrichtung (10) erste Walzenpaar höher als das folgende Walzenpaar angeordnet, die jeweils durch die Achsen (6) der Presswalzen (4,5) der Walzenpaare verlaufende Presslinie (7) gegenüber der Vertikalen (8) in Bahnlaufrichtung (10) geneigt ist und die Faserstoffbahn (1) die Preßspalte (2) horizontal oder vorzugsweise nach unten geneigt verläßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077283 A2 20010221; EP 1077283 A3 20010516; EP 1077283 B1 20040512; DE 19938979 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100722

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-08-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006381

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI