Global Patent Index - EP 1078352 A2

EP 1078352 A2 2001-02-28 - A BUS ARRANGEMENT FOR A DRIVER OF A MATRIX DISPLAY

Title (en)

A BUS ARRANGEMENT FOR A DRIVER OF A MATRIX DISPLAY

Title (de)

BUSANORDNUNG FÜR ANSTEUERSCHALTUNG EINER MATRIXANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BUS POUR PILOTE D'AFFICHEUR

Publication

EP 1078352 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99921838 A

Priority

  • US 9910227 W
  • US 8576698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960555A2] A demultiplexer applies picture information to pixels arranged in an array of a display device having columns and rows. The demultiplexer includes transistor switches each having a control terminal, an input terminal and an output terminal. A first buss couples switch control signals to the control terminals of the switches. The conductors of a first buss extend in a region containing each of the switches to form a global buss arrangement. Local busses have each conductors coupled to the input terminals of the switches associated with the individual local buss. The output terminals of the switches associated with the individual local buss are coupled to corresponding, consecutively disposed column conductors of the array. The individual local buss has a section that crosses over the first buss and a second section extending between the crossover section and the input terminals of the associated switches. The conductors of the second section extend in a region containing the associated switches and are absent from regions containing switches associated with the other local busses to obtain buss separation forming a local clustering buss arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/36 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3688 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 3/3685 (2013.01); G09G 2310/027 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0297 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960555A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960555 A2 19991125; WO 9960555 A3 20000309; AU 3894799 A 19991206; CN 1183501 C 20050105; CN 1301377 A 20010627; EP 1078352 A2 20010228; EP 1078352 B1 20150708; JP 2002516417 A 20020604; JP 5240884 B2 20130717; MX PA00011202 A 20030422; TW 519612 B 20030201; ZA 200006423 B 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69945360

- Representative's name: HOFSTETTER, SCHURACK & PARTNER PATENT- UND REC, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160511

2017-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160511

2016-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160411

2016-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69945360

2015-08-20 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69945360

2015-08-18 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69945360

2015-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-07-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-03-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150211

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09G 3/28 20130101ALI20150119BHEP

2015-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09G 3/36 20060101AFI20150119BHEP

2015-01-19 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69945360

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G09G0001000000

- IPC: G09G0003360000

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB