Global patent index - EP 1080254 A1

EP 1080254 A1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR REMOVING A HARD MATERIAL LAYER DEPOSITED ON A HARD METAL WORK PIECE, AND A FIXING DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE WORK PIECE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVING A HARD MATERIAL LAYER DEPOSITED ON A HARD METAL WORK PIECE, AND A FIXING DEVICE FOR AT LEAST ONE WORK PIECE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHICHTUNG EINER AUF EINEM HARTMETALL-WERKSTÜCK AUFGEBRACHTEN HARTSTOFFSCHICHT UND HALTERUNG FÜR MINDESTENS EIN WERKSTÜCK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ELIMINER UNE COUCHE DE SUBSTANCE DURE APPLIQUEE SUR UNE PIECE EN METAL DUR ET ELEMENT DE RETENUE POUR AU MOINS UNE PIECE

Publication

EP 1080254 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913496 A

Priority

CH 9800152 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954528A1] A hard material layer deposited on a hard metal work piece is removed by electrolytic passivation in which a maximum current density equal to at least 0.01 A/cm<2> is generated on the work piece at the beginning of the layer removal process. In doing this, the hard material layer rapidly flakes off without causing substantial damage to the hard metal material located underneath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2013.01); C25F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954528A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954528 A1 19991028; AU 6818898 A 19991108; DE 59808931 D1 20030807; EP 1080254 A1 20010307; EP 1080254 B1 20030702; JP 2002512309 A 20020423; JP 4434489 B2 20100317

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150422

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150421

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150421

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-01-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TRADING AG, TRUEBBACH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OC OERLIKON BALZERS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR REMOVING A HARD MATERIAL LAYER DEPOSITED ON A HARD METAL WORK PIECE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE