Global Patent Index - EP 1080365 A1

EP 1080365 A1 2001-03-07 - SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE SENSOR FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS MEASUREMENT OF A PLURALITY OF SAMPLES IN FLUID FORM

Title (en)

SURFACE PLASMON RESONANCE SENSOR FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS MEASUREMENT OF A PLURALITY OF SAMPLES IN FLUID FORM

Title (de)

SPR-SENSOR ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN ERFASSUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON IN FLUIDER FORM VORLIEGENDEN PROBEN

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR DE R SONANCE DE PLASMONS SUPERFICIELS POUR LA MESURE SIMULTANEE D'UNE PLURALITE D'ECHANTILLONS SOUS FORME FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1080365 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952120 A

Priority

  • DE 19822557 A
  • EP 9903596 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960382A1] The invention relates to a surface plasmon resonance sensor for the simultaneous measurement of a plurality of samples present in fluid form. The aim of the invention is to provide such a sensor which can be arranged into a defined array and where the surface plasmon resonance sensors can be produced using technology which is simpler and more economical than those produced according to the prior art. To this end several strip-like optical wave guides (2) are arranged on a planar support (1) at a defined distance to each other in such a way that their front faces (21, 22) are flush with opposite sides (11, 12) of the planar support (1). Each strip-like optical wave guide (2) in a section which is to be brought into contact with the fluid samples has at least one thin metal layer (3) which permits the excitation of surface plasmons. Means (14) are provided for which separate the measurement zones of the individual thin metal layers (3) from each other in such a way that each of the optical wave guides (2) can be assigned to only one sample.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/27 (2006.01); G01N 21/552 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/253 (2013.01); G01N 21/553 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960382A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960382 A1 19991125; AU 4266499 A 19991206; AU 771043 B2 20040311; CA 2319429 A1 19991125; DE 19923820 A1 20000120; DE 19923820 C2 20010510; EP 1080365 A1 20010307; JP 2002518663 A 20020625; US 6373577 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071201

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRAFFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRAFFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRAFFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRAEUER, ANDREAS

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DANZ, NORBERT

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, KRISTINA

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VETTER, DIRK

2003-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WALDHAEUSL, RALF

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE