Global patent index - EP 1081379 A1

EP 1081379 A1 2001-03-07 - CONTROL VALVE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

CONTROL VALVE FOR VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

REGELVENTIL FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSOR MIT VERÄNDERLICHER VERDRÄNGUNG

Title (fr)

VANNE DE REGLAGE A DEPLACEMENT VARIABLE POUR COMPRESSEUR

Publication

EP 1081379 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905271 A

Priority

JP 9900786 W

Abstract (en)

A control valve for variable displacement compressor that prevents fluid fixation between a rod and a guide hole is provided. A first rod (89) extends through a first guide hole (88) to couple a bellows (87) to a valve body (74). A second rod (96) extends through a second guide hole (95) to couple a movable iron core (93) to the valve body (74). Tapered surfaces (89b, 96b) are formed on the outer surfaces of the first and second rods (89, 96). The space between each tapered surface (89b 96b) and the inner surface (88a, 95a) of the corresponding guide hole (88, 95) is wider in the vicinity of a high pressure zone (73, 90) than in the vicinity of a low pressure zone (84, 91). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/00; F04B 27/18; F04B 53/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1854 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1859 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081379 A1 20010307; EP 1081379 A4 20040707; WO 0050775 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-07-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 04B 49/00 A

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 04B 53/10 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 04B 27/18 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT