Global Patent Index - EP 1081433 A1

EP 1081433 A1 2001-03-07 - Feeding pit for waste incinerator with cutting apparatus

Title (en)

Feeding pit for waste incinerator with cutting apparatus

Title (de)

Fallschacht eines Beschickungssystems einer Abfallverbrennungsanlage mit einer Schneidvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Puits d'alimentation d'incinérateur d'ordures avec dispositif de sectionnement

Publication

EP 1081433 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117241 A

Priority

CH 159799 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure well of a charging system (58) of a waste combustion plant comprises a cutting device (10) having a pulling and pushing mechanism (18) and a knifing disk (24). The pulling and pushing mechanism moves to and fro between an open position exposing the pressure well (12) and a closed position. The knifing disk can be moved over a gap between a pressure pad (16) and the pulling and pushing mechanism when the closed position is not reached as a result of waste being present between the pad and the mechanism. Preferred Features: The pressure pad is formed as a disk element, and the pad and the pulling and pushing mechanism can move in a common plane at right angles to the longitudinal direction of the well.

Abstract (de)

Der Fallschacht (12) ist mit einer Schneidvorrichtung (10) versehen, die einen Gegenhalter (16), einen Klemmschieber (18) und einen Schneidschieber (24) aufweist. Zum Verschliessen des Fallschachts (12) wird der Gegenhalter (16) bis etwa mittig in den Fallschacht (12) eingefahren und verriegelt. Dann wird der Klemmschieber (18) in Richtung auf den Gegenhalter (16) zubewegt, bis diese einander berühren und der Fallschacht (12) verschlossen ist. Befindet sich Abfall zwischen dem Gegenhalter (16) und dem Klemmschieber (18) und dieser somit seine Schliessstellung nicht erreichen kann, wird der Schneidschieber (24) aktiviert, welcher den zwischen Gegenhalter (16) und Klemmschieber (18) eingeklemmten Abfall durchtrennt und den Spalt (56) zwischen dem Gegenhalter (16) und dem Klemmschieber (18) dichtend überbrückt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/44; B65D 90/58; C10B 53/00; F23G 5/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/02 (2006.01); F23G 5/033 (2006.01); F23G 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/033 (2013.01); F23G 5/444 (2013.01); F23G 2205/16 (2013.01); F23G 2205/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1081433 A1 20010307; EP 1081433 B1 20041020; CZ 20003205 A3 20010411; CZ 295924 B6 20051116; DE 50008305 D1 20041125; JP 2001082717 A 20010330; JP 3507980 B2 20040315; KR 100386297 B1 20030602; KR 20010030249 A 20010416; TW 455667 B 20010921; US 6382112 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060815

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008305 P 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI