Global Patent Index - EP 1082781 A1

EP 1082781 A1 2001-03-14 - ANTENNA ARRAY WITH SEVERAL VERTICALLY SUPERPOSED PRIMARY RADIATOR MODULES

Title (en)

ANTENNA ARRAY WITH SEVERAL VERTICALLY SUPERPOSED PRIMARY RADIATOR MODULES

Title (de)

ANTENNENARRAY MIT MEHREREN VERTIKAL ÜBEREINANDER ANGEORDNETEN PRIMÄRSTRAHLER-MODULEN

Title (fr)

RESEAU D'ANTENNES A PLUSIEURS MODULES EXCITATEURS SUPERPOSES

Publication

EP 1082781 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926351 A

Priority

  • DE 19823750 A
  • EP 9903483 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823750A1] An improved antenna array comprises at least two vertically superposed primary radiator modules (1, 3) located in front of a reflector (5), and is characterised as follows: At least one first primary radiator module (1) of a first type and at least one second primary radiator module (3) of a second type are provided, these being vertically superposed at a distance; the primary radiator module(s) (1) of the first type has/have a different horizontal half-value width to the primary radiator module(s) (3) of the second type, so that it is possible to obtain a different horizontal total half-width value of the whole antenna; and the primary radiator module(s) (1) of the first type have a different constructional configuration to the primary radiator module(s) (3) of the second type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/29; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 21/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/10 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 21/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962138A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823750 A1 19991209; AU 4364899 A 19991213; AU 751894 B2 20020829; BR 9910712 A 20010130; CA 2331416 A1 19991202; CA 2331416 C 20021210; CN 1134860 C 20040114; CN 1303529 A 20010711; EP 1082781 A1 20010314; EP 1082781 B1 20020306; ES 2174613 T3 20021101; HK 1038281 A1 20040930; US 6339407 B1 20020115; WO 9962138 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100520

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060520

2005-05-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174613 T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900948 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE