Global Patent Index - EP 1084478 A1

EP 1084478 A1 2001-03-21 - INTERNET ADVERTISING SYSTEM

Title (en)

INTERNET ADVERTISING SYSTEM

Title (de)

WERBUNGSSYSTEM IM INTERNET

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PUBLICITAIRE SUR INTERNET

Publication

EP 1084478 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918973 A

Priority

  • AU 9900350 W
  • AU PP347398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959097A1] In a computer user interface environment for the display of information, a method is disclosed of providing push content delivery comprising the steps of: (a) providing a popup window having determined content, the popup window being provided after a predetermined time of a user viewing predetermined information and the recording of the completion of content delivery where the user has not closed the abovementioned popup window prior to completion of the display of the determined content and (b) the window disappearing after a second predetermined interval.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 19/00; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959097 A1 19991118; AU PP347398 D0 19980604; CN 1305615 A 20010725; EP 1084478 A1 20010321; EP 1084478 A4 20041124

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050418

2004-11-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 19/00 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE