Global Patent Index - EP 1086279 A1

EP 1086279 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD FOR BUILDING A STRUCTURE WHEREOF THE GROUND AREA IS COMPLETELY FREE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR BUILDING A STRUCTURE WHEREOF THE GROUND AREA IS COMPLETELY FREE

Title (de)

ERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES GEBÄUDES DESSEN GRUNDFLÄCHE VOLLKOMMEN FREI IST

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION DE BATIMENT DONT LA SURFACE AU SOL EST TOTALEMENT DEGAGEE

Publication

EP 1086279 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920944 A

Priority

  • FR 9901269 W
  • FR 9807152 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779459A1] The invention concerns a building method comprising reinforcements mutually linked by cables (5a, 5b, etc) forming loops located in substantially parallel planes at the structure base, characterised in that cables (6b, 6c, etc) are stretched, each one, between each reinforcement upper part, preferably in the form of a hyperbolic arc, and the lower part of the adjacent reinforcements, said cables passing beneath the sheet of cables (5a, 5b, etc).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34 (2006.01); E04H 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 5/12 (2013.01); E04B 1/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964687A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779459 A1 19991210; FR 2779459 B1 20000804; AU 3833099 A 19991230; DE 69915288 D1 20040408; EP 1086279 A1 20010328; EP 1086279 B1 20040303; WO 9964687 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-09-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915288

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL