Global Patent Index - EP 1086434 A1

EP 1086434 A1 2001-03-28 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING A COOKIE

Title (en)

A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING A COOKIE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINER BELOHNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION D'UN MESSAGE DE QUALIFICATION D'AUDIENCE

Publication

EP 1086434 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931671 A

Priority

  • SE 9900992 W
  • SE 9802098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964967A1] In a transmission system a proxy server (66) is located between a user terminal (52) and a server (70). The proxy server has means for intercepting and storing cookies transmitted from the server (70) to the user terminal (52). When a server (70) is contacted by a user terminal (52) and the server (70) transmits a cookie to the user terminal (52), the cookie is intercepted and stored in the proxy server (66). Information regarding the remote server, e.g. its URL and an identification identifying the user terminal (52) is stored together with the cookie. The next time the user terminal (52) accesses the same server (70) the proxy server (66) matches the requested URL and the identification information and in this manner finds the stored cookie. The cookie is then added to the request message so that the server (70) is accessed with a copy of the cookie as desired. In this manner the cookies do not need to be stored in the user terminal (52), which may have a small memory and which therefore is not suited for storing cookies. Furthermore, when the user terminal (52) is a mobile terminal the cookie is not transmitted over an air-interface, thereby reducing the risk of eavesdropping significantly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/2804 (2013.01); G06F 17/30899 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/2819 (2013.01); H04L 67/2828 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964967A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964967 A1 19991216; AU 4811499 A 19991230; AU 758578 B2 20030327; BR 9911164 A 20010327; CN 1135489 C 20040121; CN 1305613 A 20010725; EE 03983 B1 20030217; EE 200000711 A 20020415; EP 1086434 A1 20010328; HK 1039192 A1 20041203; JP 2002517861 A 20020618; MY 124068 A 20060630; SE 512672 C2 20000417; SE 9802098 D0 19980612; SE 9802098 L 19991213

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NILSSON, MIKAEL

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSSON, FREDRIK

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TORSTENSSON, SOEREN

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGLUND, MAGNUS

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT