Global patent index - EP 1086764 A1

EP 1086764 A1 2001-03-28 - Twin roll strip casting device

Title (en)

Twin roll strip casting device

Title (de)

Bandgiessmaschine mit zwei Giessrollen

Title (fr)

Appareil de coulée de bande a deux cylindres

Publication

EP 1086764 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811005 A

Priority

CH 174999 A

Abstract (en)

Continuous casting machine consists of two parallel casting rolls (2, 3), two narrow side parts (4) and a machine stand (5) for supporting the rolls. The narrow side parts are adjusted on the front sides by balls of the rolls and can be exchanged using an exchanging device. The exchanging device is formed as a support arm (9) for a narrow side and can be moved in one plane that is essentially parallel to the sealing surface (25) of the narrow part from an adjusting position downwards. Preferred Features: The support arm moves the narrow side parts vertically about a pivoting axis or along a curve.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Bandgiessmaschine bestehend aus zwei parallel angeordneten Giessrollen (2, 3), zwei Schmalseitenteilen (4) und einem Maschinenständer (5) zum Abstützen der beiden Giessrollen (2, 3) sind die Schmalseitenteile (4) mit einer Schmalseitenwechselvorrichtung auswechselbar. Um die Rüstzeit zwischen zwei Güssen zu verkürzen, die Schmalseiten genauer zu positionieren und bis zum Giessbeginn beheizen zu können sowie die Zugänglichkeit zu den Giessrollen bei einem Giessrollenwechsel und eine optimale Inertisierung der Anlage schaffen zu können, soll die Schmalseitenwechselvorrichtung als Tragarm ( 9) für eine Schmalseite (4) ausgebildet werden. Im weiteren soll der Tragarm (9) und die Schmalseite (4) in eine Ebene im wesentlichen parallel zur Dichtfläche der Schmalseite (4) aus einer Anstellposition nach unten verschiebbar sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 19617420 C1 19971002 - MAX PLANCK INST EISENFORSCHUNG [DE]
  • [A] DE 4307850 C1 19940609 - USINOR SACILOR PUTEAUX [FR], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 151 (M - 1576) 14 March 1994 (1994-03-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 388 (M - 549) 25 December 1986 (1986-12-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086764 A1 20010328; AT 243585 T 20030715; AU 7658000 A 20010430; CH 691573 A5 20010831; CN 1200787 C 20050511; CN 1376096 A 20021023; DE 50002671 D1 20030731; EA 003384 B1 20030424; EP 1214164 A1 20020619; EP 1214164 B1 20030625; ES 2202175 T3 20040401; US 6763878 B1 20040720; WO 0123119 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010929

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI