Global Patent Index - EP 1086805 A1

EP 1086805 A1 2001-03-28 - Machine for producing corrugated board and method of calibrating the glue applicator gap in such a machine

Title (en)

Machine for producing corrugated board and method of calibrating the glue applicator gap in such a machine

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung einer Wellpappebahn sowie ein Verfahren zur Kalibrierung des Beleimungsspaltes einer solchen Maschine

Title (fr)

Machine pour la fabrication du carton ondulé ainsi qu'un méthode de calibration l'emprise d'un dispositif d'encollage utilisé dans une telle machine

Publication

EP 1086805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00118589 A

Priority

  • DE 19945388 A
  • DE 10034780 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a corrugation roller (3) and a parallel sizing roller (22) spaced apart by a sizing gap (30), which is adjusted by application of a pressure force on the bearing (27) of the sizing roller in the direction of the corrugation roller bearing (33), under control of a calibration device (37 with a force measuring device (41) indicating a drop in bearing force upon contact between the corrugation roller and the sizing roller.. An Independent claim for a calibrating method for a corrugated paper web manufacturing machine is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine zur Herstellung von Wellpappe weist eine Riffelwalze (3) und eine parallel zu dieser verlaufende Leimauftragswalze (22) auf wobei zwischen beiden ein Beleimungsspalt (30) gebildet wird. Zur Einstellung des Beleimungsspaltes (30) wird das Lager (27) der Leimauftragswalze (22) mit einer Anpreß-Kraft A gegen das Lager (33) der Riffelwalze gedrückt. Durch eine Stell-Einrichtung (42) wird der Abstand der beiden Lager (27, 33) solange reduziert, bis die durch eine Kraft-Meßeinheit (41) gemessene Lager-Anpreß-Kraft infolge eines Kontaktes der Leimauftragswalze (22) und der Riffelwalze (3) abfällt. Die Leimauftragswalze (22) kann endseitige Anlaufringe (36a) aufweisen, um einen unmittelbaren Kontakt von Leimauftragswalze (22) und Riffelwalze (3) zu vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/28; B05C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B31F 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/2818 (2013.01); B05C 1/083 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1086805 A1 20010328; EP 1086805 B1 20041110; US 6692602 B1 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BHS CORRUGATED MASCHINEN-UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008578 P 20041216

2004-12-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040109

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI