Global Patent Index - EP 1087644 A1

EP 1087644 A1 2001-03-28 - Improvements in driving of discharge lamps in particular for vehicle headlamps

Title (en)

Improvements in driving of discharge lamps in particular for vehicle headlamps

Title (de)

Verbesserungen in der Steuerung von Entladungslampen, insbesondere in Fahrzeugscheinwerfern

Title (fr)

Perfectionnements à la commande de l'alimentation de lampes à décharge notamment de projecteurs de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1087644 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402459 A

Priority

FR 9912114 A

Abstract (en)

The incoming supply is received by a DC/DC converter (1), the input being derived through a switching transistor (Q1) which controls the primary of a transformer (T). The converter output forms the input to a DC/AC converter, supplying the lamp. This converter's bridge rectifier employs transistors switched at frequencies in the range 200-1000 Hz and gives rise to significant electromagnetic interference. The switching of the DC/DC converter transistor is controlled by a regulator (4). By suitably programming the latter, the power delivered to the lamp is modulated in a pseudo-random sequence by a fractional amount, e.g. plus or minus 500 mW on a mean power of 35 W, the resulting frequency spectrum spread substantially reducing the interference, typically by up to 8 dB. Opt., modulation is achieved by the analogue addition of a separately generated power increment/decrement at the output of the DC/DC converter.

Abstract (fr)

Selon le procédé pour la commande d'un dispositif d'alimentation d'une lampe à décharge notamment de projecteur de véhicule automobile, ledit dispositif d'alimentation comportant un convertisseur continu/alternatif, on module dans le temps la puissance d'alimentation fournie audit convertisseur continu/alternatif. La puissance d'alimentation fournie au convertisseur continu/alternatif est modulée selon une séquence pseudo-aléatoire. L'invention concerne également un dispositif d'alimentation qui met en oeuvre ce procédé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H02M 7/537 (2006.01); H05B 41/16 (2006.01); H05B 41/292 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2928 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0744883 A1 19961127 - PRAEZISA IND ELEKTRONIK [DE]
  • [X] EP 0785702 A2 19970723 - OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0291223 A1 19881117 - EMI PLC THORN [GB]
  • [Y] EP 0944294 A2 19990922 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [X] STORMBERG H -P ET AL: "EXCITATION OF ACOUSTIC INSTABILITIES IN DISCHARGE LAMPS WITH PULSEDSUPPLY VOLTAGE", LIGHTING RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY,GB,ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING SOCIETY, LONDON, vol. 15, no. 3, 1 March 1983 (1983-03-01), pages 127 - 132, XP002052920, ISSN: 0024-3426

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1087644 A1 20010328; EP 1087644 B1 20061102; DE 60031620 D1 20061214; DE 60031620 T2 20070906; ES 2275478 T3 20070616; FR 2799062 A1 20010330; FR 2799062 B1 20011221; JP 2001157463 A 20010608; JP 4542251 B2 20100908; US 6556463 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130907

2014-10-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141009

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130906

2014-07-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60031620

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120913

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275478 T3

2007-05-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031620 P 20061214

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI