Global Patent Index - EP 1090419 A1

EP 1090419 A1 2001-04-11 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING A DEVICE HAVING A CAVITY WITH CONTROLLED ATMOSPHERE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FORMING A DEVICE HAVING A CAVITY WITH CONTROLLED ATMOSPHERE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG MIT KAVITÄT KONTROLLIERTER ATMOSPHÄRE UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN DISPOSITIF PRESENTANT UNE CAVITE A ATMOSPHERE CONTROLEE

Publication

EP 1090419 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925122 A

Priority

  • FR 9901457 W
  • FR 9807841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780200A1] The system uses two rings of material - one to seal and one to adhere components.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The device comprises a support plate (100) and at least one cover (104) capable of being sealed to the support to form with it a cavity (114). This provides a controlled atmosphere around a component (102). Either the cover or the support is provided with a wedge (110) made of fusible material, and a seal bead (112) formed around the component. Prior to being sealed, the fusible material wedge is of sufficient thickness to prevent the seal bead from coming into contact with the second component (cover or support) when these two parts are assembled. The components are heated within a controlled environment, with the required atmospheric conditions, rising to a temperature at which the fusible material melts to adhere the components

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/50; H01L 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 7/00 (2006.01); B81C 3/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/50 (2006.01); H01L 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/10 (2013.01); B81C 1/00269 (2013.01); B81C 3/002 (2013.01); H01L 21/50 (2013.01); B81C 2203/019 (2013.01); B81C 2203/032 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29011 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29013 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73103 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73203 (2013.01); H01L 2224/81191 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/16152 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/73103 + H01L 2924/00012
  2. H01L 2224/73203 + H01L 2924/00012

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967818A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780200 A1 19991224; FR 2780200 B1 20030905; EP 1090419 A1 20010411; US 6566170 B1 20030520; WO 9967818 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150123

2015-01-23 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB IT SE