Global Patent Index - EP 1097248 A1

EP 1097248 A1 2001-05-09 - CASE HARDENED STEEL WITH HIGH TEMPERING TEMPERATURE, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND PARTS FORMED WITH SAID STEEL

Title (en)

CASE HARDENED STEEL WITH HIGH TEMPERING TEMPERATURE, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND PARTS FORMED WITH SAID STEEL

Title (de)

EINSATZSTAHL MIT HOHER ANLASSTEMPERATUR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIESEN STAHL UND WERKSTÜCKE AUS DIESEM STAHL

Title (fr)

ACIER DE CEMENTATION A TEMPERATURE DE REVENU ELEVEE, PROCEDE POUR SON OBTENTION ET PIECES FORMEES AVEC CET ACIER

Publication

EP 1097248 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99926549 A

Priority

  • FR 9901543 W
  • FR 9808247 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780418A1] A case hardening steel, with specified contents of nickel, manganese, copper, cobalt, chromium, molybdenum and vanadium, is new. A novel case hardening steel has the composition (by wt.) 0.06-0.18% C, 0.5-1.5% Si, 0.2-1.5% Cr, 1-3.5% Ni, 1.1-3.5% Mo, \} 1.6% Mn, \} 0.4% V, \} 2% Cu, \} 4% Co, balance Fe and impurities, with the proviso that Ni + Mn + 1.5 Cu + 0.5 Co = 2.5 to 5 wt. % and Cr + Mo + V = 2.4 to 3.7 wt. %. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) production of case hardened parts by producing the above steel in an arc furnace, subjecting cast ingots to reheating and hot working, carrying out a homogenization and grain refining heat treatment, case hardening and heat treating according to use; (ii) a steel part having the above composition; and (iii) a steel part made by the above process. Preferred Features: The steel has the composition 0.09-0.16 % C, 0.7-1.3 % Si, 0.5-1.2% Cr, 2-3 % Ni, 1.5-2.5% Mo, 0.2-0.7 % Mn, 0.15-0.35 % V, 0.3-1.1 % Cu, \} 1.5 % Co, \} 0.020 % P, \}0.010 % S, \}0.1 % each of Al, Ce, Ti, Zr, Ca and Nb, balance Fe and impurities. Arc furnace melting may be carried out by vacuum induction melting and may be followed by consumable electrode remelting. The homogenization and grain refining heat treatment step comprises normalizing at above the Ac3 point, air cooling and soft tempering at below the Ac1 point. Case hardening is carried out at low pressure and is followed by cooling to ambient temperature, reheating to 900 -1050 deg C, oil or gas quenching and tempering at up to 350 deg C.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/44; C22C 38/42; C22C 38/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C23C 8/22 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C21D 6/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C23C 8/22 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C21D 1/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000658A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780418 A1 19991231; FR 2780418 B1 20000908; AR 019175 A1 20011226; AT 216739 T 20020515; BR 9912226 A 20010508; CA 2335911 A1 20000106; CA 2335911 C 20090901; DE 69901345 D1 20020529; DE 69901345 T2 20021219; DK 1097248 T3 20020701; EP 1097248 A1 20010509; EP 1097248 B1 20020424; ES 2175985 T3 20021116; US 6699333 B1 20040302; WO 0000658 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170707

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090628

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090628

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AUBERT & DUVAL

- Free text: AUBERT & DUVAL#41, RUE DE VILLIERS#F-92200 NEUILLY-SUR-SEINE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- AUBERT & DUVAL#41, RUE DE VILLIERS#F-92200 NEUILLY-SUR-SEINE (FR)

2006-11-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-11-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-11-10 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2006-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175985 T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901345 20020529

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216739 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU SE