Global Patent Index - EP 1098684 A1

EP 1098684 A1 2001-05-16 - FITNESS APPARATUS

Title (en)

FITNESS APPARATUS

Title (de)

FITNESSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE CONDITIONNEMENT PHYSIQUE

Publication

EP 1098684 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926371 A

Priority

  • DE 19832235 A
  • EP 9903538 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832235A1] The exercise machine has a carriage (2) for at least one person, movably mounted on a support element (1) by at least one control element (7.1). At least one energy accumulator (19.1,19.2) in one or more parts is connected to the control element and or carriage, and has a power-transmission element (20). The support element comprises at least one and especially two straight or curved parallel guide rails (13.1) spaced apart at different levels by means of struts on a base. Each rail-end has deflector elements (21.1,21.2) for the energy accumulator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 69/06; A63B 21/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/06 (2006.01); A63B 21/05 (2006.01); A63B 21/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0076 (2013.01); A63B 21/156 (2013.01); A63B 21/0428 (2013.01); A63B 21/05 (2013.01); A63B 21/0557 (2013.01); A63B 22/0089 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0084 (2013.01); A63B 2208/0228 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003770A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832235 A1 20000127; DE 19832235 C2 20001026; AU 4366199 A 20000207; EP 1098684 A1 20010516; EP 1098684 B1 20031022; US 6527676 B1 20030304; WO 0003770 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060522

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL SE