Global Patent Index - EP 1144138 B1

EP 1144138 B1 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR GRINDING AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ON A CUTTING KNIFE USED IN MACHINING, USE OF SAID METHOD AND GRINDING WHEEL USED TO CARRY OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GRINDING AT LEAST ONE SURFACE ON A CUTTING KNIFE USED IN MACHINING, USE OF SAID METHOD AND GRINDING WHEEL USED TO CARRY OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLEIFEN VON WENIGSTENS EINER FLÄCHE AN EINEM IN DER ZERSPANTECHNIK EINGESETZTEN SCHNEIDMESSER, VERWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS UND SCHLEIFSCHEIBE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MEULER AU MOINS UNE FACE D'UNE LAME UTILISEE DANS LA TECHNIQUE D'ENLEVEMENT DE COPEAUX, MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE ET MEULE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1144138 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932711 A

Priority

  • DE 19827897 A
  • EP 9904327 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827897A1] The procedure use a grinding disc (28) rotating about an axis (38) whose working region (34) is an annular surface with a curved profile in axial section. The process comprises two stages: (a) generation of a surface on the cutting blade by grinding with the annular surface and (b) over-grinding of at least one part of the generated surface with the annular surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/34 (2006.01); B24D 3/00 (2006.01); B24D 3/06 (2006.01); B24D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/346 (2013.01); B24D 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827897 A1 19991230; AU 4900299 A 20000110; EP 1144138 A2 20011017; EP 1144138 A3 20021218; EP 1144138 B1 20021106; JP 2003516237 A 20030513; JP 4450993 B2 20100414; US 6712675 B1 20040330; WO 9967036 A2 19991229; WO 9967036 A3 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903360

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2005-06-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903360 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.