Global Patent Index - EP 1144705 A3

EP 1144705 A3 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COATED METAL STRANDS, ESPECIALLY STEEL STRIPS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COATED METAL STRANDS, ESPECIALLY STEEL STRIPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BESCHICHTETEN STRÄNGEN AUS METALL, INSBESONDERE VON BÄNDERN AUS STAHL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES BANDES DE METAL, NOTAMMENT DES FEUILLARDS D'ACIER, MUNIES D'UN REVETEMENT

Publication

EP 1144705 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00901068 A

Priority

  • DE 19902066 A
  • EP 0000060 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19902066A1] The invention relates to a method for producing coated metal strands, notably steel strips (1), according to which a metal strand (1.) is guided through the bottom of a vessel (3) filled with a molten bath (3.3) of the same or a different composition as the metal strand (1.1). The dwell time of the metal strand (1.1) is selected in accordance with the bath level (3.3.1), the casting speed, the metal strand thickness and the preheating temperature of the metal strand such that the melt which is deposited on the metal strand has a desired thickness which is a multiple of the initial thickness of the metal strand and that said metal strand (1.), on which a partially crystallized layer (3.6) is formed, undergoes a skin pass (2) after delivery from the molten bath (3.3). The skin pass is carried out when the surface temperature of the partially crystallized strand (3.6) is lower than the solidus temperature of the molten bath (3.3) so that at least the surface (1.3) of the partially crystallized layer (3.6) has solidified. According to the invention a controlled thickness of said partially crystallized layer is obtained if between the molten bath (3.4) and the onset of solidification (9.3) on the strip surface (1.3) the crystallized layer (3.6) having a given thickness (1.2) is stripped (20) to a smaller thickness (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); C23C 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/008 (2013.01); C23C 2/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902066 A1 20000803; AT 219160 T 20020615; AU 2106200 A 20000807; EP 1144705 A2 20011017; EP 1144705 A3 20021113; EP 1144705 B1 20020612; US 6565925 B1 20030520; WO 0043563 A2 20000727; WO 0043563 A3 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1144705E

2003-02-05 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 22D 11/00 A

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000212 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219160 T 20020615

2002-06-12 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.