Global Patent Index - EP 1160761 A2

EP 1160761 A2 2001-12-05 - Display control method, game machine, and recording medium having recorded thereon processing program, for inhibiting unsmooth movement of display image

Title (en)

Display control method, game machine, and recording medium having recorded thereon processing program, for inhibiting unsmooth movement of display image

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Anzeige, Spielvorrichtung, und Aufzeichnungsmedium mit einem Programm zum Verhindern von stossartigen Bewegungen des angezeigten Bildes

Title (fr)

Méthode de commande d'affichage, appareil de jeu, et support d'enregistrement comportant un programme pour prévenir un mouvement cahotant de l'image affichée

Publication

EP 1160761 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01303909 A

Priority

JP 2000161440 A

Abstract (en)

A display image (201) which is substantially identical with a display image (200) and has the minimum opacity is caused to emerge so as to overlap the display image (200). Next, the display image (201) is shifted one dot to the right, and opacity of the display image (201) is increased gradually until opacity assumes a value of 100%. Further, the display image (200) is erased from the display area. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); G06T 13/00 (2011.01); G06T 13/80 (2011.01); G09G 5/34 (2006.01); G09G 5/36 (2006.01); G09G 5/377 (2006.01); H04N 5/262 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/346 (2013.01); A63F 2300/203 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1160761 A2 20011205; EP 1160761 A3 20030115; JP 2001343967 A 20011214; US 2001053715 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONAMI CORPORATION

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI