Global Patent Index - EP 1207226 B1

EP 1207226 B1 2003-06-04 - Apparatus for fluid treatment of yarn and a yarn composed of entangled multifilament

Title (en)

Apparatus for fluid treatment of yarn and a yarn composed of entangled multifilament

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung eines Garnes mit einer Flüssigkeit und verwirbeltes Multifilamentgarn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement d'un fil par un fluide et fil constitué de multifilaments entrelacés

Publication

EP 1207226 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01131058 A

Priority

EP 98105806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1207226A1] An apparatus for fluid treatment of yarn, which has a yarn passage and a fluid passage with a fluid outlet in the yarn passage, wherein the fluid passage has a straight passage and an expanding passage existing between the end of the straight passage and the fluid outlet, and that the width of the expanding passage in the direction parallel to the axial line of the yarn passage increases gradually from the end of the straight passage to the fluid outlet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 1/08; D02G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 1/08 (2013.01); D02G 1/161 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1207226 A1 20020522; EP 1207226 B1 20030604; DE 69811853 D1 20030410; DE 69811853 T2 20031113

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.

- Free text: TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.#2-1, NIHONBASHI MUROMACHI 2-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 103-8666 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.#2-1, NIHONBASHI MUROMACHI 2-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 103-8666 (JP)

2007-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060330

2005-03-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815405 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0947619 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAIJO, TERUAKI

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANO, TAKAO

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIMADA, KOUJI

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-05-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 947619