Global Patent Index - EP 1207275 A3

EP 1207275 A3 2003-06-25 - Four-cycle engine

Title (en)

Four-cycle engine

Title (de)

Viertakt Motor

Title (fr)

Moteur 4 temps

Publication

EP 1207275 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01121944 A

Priority

JP 2000349951 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1207275A2] The invention provides a four-cycle engine, in which a pair of intake valve ports openable/closable by respective intake valves and a pair of exhaust valve ports openable/closable by respective exhaust valves are provided in a cylinder head in such a manner as to be positioned on both sides of a first virtual plane containing the axial line of a cylinder bore and passing through an approximately central portion of a combustion chamber, and a pair of ignition plugs are mounted in the cylinder head, characterized by minimizing the degradation of a flame propagation condition even if there occurs accidental fire in either of both the ignition plugs. A pair of ignition plugs (80), which are disposed substantially symmetrically with respect to a second virtual plane (79) passing through the center of a combustion chamber (17R) and being perpendicular to a first virtual plane(78), are mounted in a cylinder head (15R) in such a manner as to have axial lines extending substantially in parallel to the first virtual plane(78) and to be tilted with a distance therebetween becoming smaller toward the combustion chamber (17R); and end portions, projecting in the combustion chamber (17R), of the ignition plugs (80) are disposed in a region surrounded by intake valve ports (76) and exhaust valve ports (77). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/04; F01L 1/02; F01L 1/14; F01L 1/18; F01L 1/26; F02B 75/24; F02F 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F02B 75/24 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/243 (2013.01); F01L 1/026 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 1/143 (2013.01); F01L 1/146 (2013.01); F01L 1/18 (2013.01); F01L 1/26 (2013.01); F01M 2011/035 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01); F02B 2275/34 (2013.01); F02F 1/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1207275 A2 20020522; EP 1207275 A3 20030625; EP 1207275 B1 20041103; AT 281587 T 20041115; CA 2360045 A1 20020516; CA 2360045 C 20050412; DE 60106846 D1 20041209; DE 60106846 T2 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080912

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-09-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60106846 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/04 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/14 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/18 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/02 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01L 1/26 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02F 1/24 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02B 75/24 B

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI