EP 1214746 A2 20020619 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND LIGHT-EMITTING MATERIAL
Title (en)
ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND LIGHT-EMITTING MATERIAL
Title (de)
ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE VORRICHTUNG UND LICHTEMITIERENDES MATERIAL
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF ORGANIQUE ELECTROLUMINESCENT ET MATIERE LUMINESCENTE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 0104202 W 20010521
- JP 2000149299 A 20000522
- US 21148600 P 20000614
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0191203A2] The invention relates to a light-emitting material and organic electroluminescent (EL) device having high emitting efficiency, in which two organic compounds that contribute to the light emission are used. These two organic compounds have a relationship among energy levels in the excited state, such that an energy transfer takes place from the excited triplet state of one compound to the excited triplet state of the other compound. The organic EL device and light-emitting material of the invention have high emitting efficiency, high luminance and durability, can surpass the marginal value of 25 % in the internal quantum efficiency conventionally acknowledged for the light-emitting materials used in organic EL devices, and can be applicable to all emission colors considered necessary for a display.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01L 51/50 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
H05B 33/14 (2013.01 - KR); H10K 50/11 (2023.02 - EP); H10K 50/121 (2023.02 - EP); H10K 2101/10 (2023.02 - EP); H10K 2101/27 (2023.02 - EP)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 0191203A2
Citation (examination)
- EP 0697744 A1 19960221 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al
- TAKESHI SANO ET AL: "Energy-Band Schemes of Highly Stable Organic Electroluminescent Devices", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 4, no. 1, 1 February 1998 (1998-02-01), XP011062348, ISSN: 1077-260X
- BALDO M A ET AL: "PHOSPHORESCENT MATERIALS FOR APPLICATION TO ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICES", PURE & APPLIED CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 71, no. 11, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 2095 - 2106, XP001182482, ISSN: 0033-4545
- NELSON DURAN ET AL: "LONG-RANGE TRIPLET-SINGLET ENERGY TRANSFER FROM ENZYME GENERATED TRIPLET ACETONE TO XANTHENE DYES", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, 1 July 1980 (1980-07-01), Great Britain, pages 113 - 116, XP055424794, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1980.tb03997.x/asset/j.1751-1097.1980.tb03997.x.pdf?v=1&t=j9zlow9m&s=bec4aea85cab34a0134d8d8ca6e065ce97463f1b> [retrieved on 20080102]
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0191203 A2 20011129; WO 0191203 A3 20020418; WO 0191203 A8 20040527; AU 5678101 A 20011203; CA 2380067 A1 20011129; EP 1214746 A2 20020619; KR 100776285 B1 20071113; KR 20020019534 A 20020312
DOCDB simple family (application)
JP 0104202 W 20010521; AU 5678101 A 20010521; CA 2380067 A 20010521; EP 01930222 A 20010521; KR 20027000642 A 20020116