Global Patent Index - EP 1236365 A1

EP 1236365 A1 2002-09-04 - PRODUCT ORDERING METHOD AND CORRESPONDING TERMINAL

Title (en)

PRODUCT ORDERING METHOD AND CORRESPONDING TERMINAL

Title (de)

PRODUKTBESTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENTSPRECHENDES ENDGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER DES PRODUITS ET TERMINAL CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1236365 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957238 A

Priority

CH 9900596 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143464A1] The invention relates to a product ordering method which enables a mobile subscriber to order products (1) in a mobile radio telephone network (4). According to the inventive method: the mobile subscriber sends an order message (31) containing a product identification to a server (5) in the designated mobile radio telephone network (4); the mobile subscriber is identified in said server (5); the seller (8) of said product (1) is identified in said server (5); the server (5) sends a message (52), in which product data and mobile subscriber attributes are contained, to said product seller (8); whereby the message sent by the server (5) contains supplementary marketing data, among other things, data concerning the location of said mobile subscriber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/22; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143464A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143464 A1 20010614; AU 1502000 A 20010618; EP 1236365 A1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-30 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

2009-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071217

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI