Global Patent Index - EP 1238386 A1

EP 1238386 A1 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND EVALUATING ADVERTISING AND INFORMATION IN TOILET FACILITIES AND A DISPLAY ARRANGEMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD IN A URINAL OR TOILET AREA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND EVALUATING ADVERTISING AND INFORMATION IN TOILET FACILITIES AND A DISPLAY ARRANGEMENT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD IN A URINAL OR TOILET AREA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG UND AUSWERTUNG VON WERBUNG UND INFORMATIONEN IN TOILETTENANLAGEN UND EINE DISPLAYANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS IN EINEM PISSOIR- ODER TOILETTENRAUM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION ET EXPLOITATION DE PUBLICITE ET D'INFORMATIONS DANS DES TOILETTES ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE DANS UNE SALLE D'URINOIRS OU DE TOILETTES

Publication

EP 1238386 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957241 A

Priority

CH 9900600 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145075A1] An advertising surface on which advertising is conveyed through still or moving images is mounted on or above a urinal (1). The advertising is activated by the user of the urinal (1) when he approaches the same. The advertising can be controlled through the Internet and can be adapted to the location and the time of transmission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/00 (2006.01); E03D 13/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/00 (2006.01); G09F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145075A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145075 A1 20010621; AT 261166 T 20040315; AU 1502300 A 20010625; DE 59908787 D1 20040408; DK 1238386 T3 20040712; EP 1238386 A1 20020911; EP 1238386 B1 20040303; ES 2217837 T3 20041101; JP 2003517159 A 20030520; MX PA02004928 A 20031014; US 6640356 B1 20031104

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171231

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: URIMAT SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: URIMAT HOLDING AG, CH

2017-10-30 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59908787

2017-10-30 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59908787

2017-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: URIMAT SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: URIMAT HOLDING AG, SACHSELN, CH

- Document: DE 59908787

2017-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908787

- Representative's name: DR. MUELLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH, CH

2015-02-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: BELLEVUEWEG 1, 8832 WOLLERAU (CH)

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908787

- Representative's name: DR. MUELLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *URIMAT HOLDING A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *URIMAT HOLDING A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-12-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217837 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-07-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2004-06-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908787 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: URIMAT HOLDING AG

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI