Global Patent Index - EP 1238552 A2

EP 1238552 A2 2002-09-11 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENABLING A USER OF A MOBILE RADIO TERMINAL TO INFLUENCE THEIR OWN RADIO QUALITY

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENABLING A USER OF A MOBILE RADIO TERMINAL TO INFLUENCE THEIR OWN RADIO QUALITY

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN, DIE EINEM MOBILFUNKENDGERÄTBENUTZER ERLAUBEN, SEINE FUNKQUALITÄT ZU BEEINFLUSSEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DESTINES A PERMETTRE A UN UTILISATEUR D'UN TERMINAL RADIO MOBILE D'INFLUENCER SA PROPRE QUALITE DE TRANSMISSION

Publication

EP 1238552 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990725 A

Priority

  • EP 0012616 W
  • US 46630799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145441A2] A system and method are provided that addresses the problematic radio shadow effect by enabling a user of a mobile radio terminal to influence their own radio quality. Basically, the system includes a mobile communications network located between a mobile radio terminal and a cellular network analyzer. The mobile radio terminal is operable to estimate its own current position within the mobile communications network, and is further operable to compare the estimated current position with a radio quality map received from the cellular network analyzer to determine the radio quality in the vicinity around the mobile radio terminal. Thus, the mobile radio terminal is capable of informing its user as to the radio quality around the current position of the mobile radio terminal which then enables the user to influence their own radio quality by moving or stopping the mobile radio terminal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/36; H04Q 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 24/00 (2009.01); H04W 16/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 24/00 (2013.01); H04W 24/08 (2013.01); H04W 24/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145441A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145441 A2 20010621; WO 0145441 A3 20020207; AU 3010301 A 20010625; CN 1435066 A 20030806; EP 1238552 A2 20020911; JP 2003517799 A 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 24/00 20090101AFI20110825BHEP

2011-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 16/00 20090101ALI20110825BHEP

2007-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070813

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI