Global Patent Index - EP 1240361 A1

EP 1240361 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR DETECTING REPLICATION COMPETENT VIRUSES IN THE SERA OF SUBJECTS RECEIVING GENE THERAPY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING REPLICATION COMPETENT VIRUSES IN THE SERA OF SUBJECTS RECEIVING GENE THERAPY

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON REPLIKATIONSFÄHIGEN VIREN IM SERUM VON SUBJEKTEN DIE EINE GENTHERARIE ERHALTEN.

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE VIRUS APTES A LA REPLICATION DANS LE SERUM DE SUJETS TRAITES PAR THERAPIE GENIQUE

Publication

EP 1240361 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00976429 A

Priority

  • KR 0001305 W
  • KR 19990050510 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136688A1] The present invention provides a method for detecting replication competent viruses in the sera of subjects receiving gene therapy, the method comprising the step of detecting anti-retroviral antibodies in the sera using a specific antigen. A gene for the antigen exists not in a viral vector for gene therapy but only in a virus genome from which the viral vector originated and the antigen is preferably selected from the group of partial Gag and partial Env proteins of murine leukemia virus. There are also provided antigens whose amino acid sequences include the sequence of SEQ ID NO: 2 or SEQ ID NO: 6, which is of great use in immunoreaction-based RCR detection in view of specificity and sensitivity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 16/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136688 A1 20010525; AU 1421201 A 20010530; CN 1411513 A 20030416; EP 1240361 A1 20020918; EP 1240361 A4 20050112; JP 2003515113 A 20030422; JP 3445984 B2 20030916; KR 20000071901 A 20001205; KR 20020089304 A 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050217

2005-01-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/569 A

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIROMED LIMITED

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIACHIP LIMITED

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI