Global Patent Index - EP 1241007 A1

EP 1241007 A1 2002-09-18 - Droplet deposition apparatus and methods of manufacture thereof

Title (en)

Droplet deposition apparatus and methods of manufacture thereof

Title (de)

Tröpfchenaufzeichnungsgerät und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Appareil utile pour deposer des goutelettes et procédés de fabrication associés

Publication

EP 1241007 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02010145 A

Priority

  • EP 98946612 A
  • GB 9721555 A

Abstract (en)

A piezoelectric printhead or other droplet deposition apparatus has parallel liquid containing channels defined by a base and displaceable walls, and covered by a cover number. The channels each have at least one nozzle for ejecting droplets. Each nozzle may be disposed in the base, the cover then having two ink supply parts spaced lengthwise of each channel on opposite sides of the nozzle. Alternatively two longitudinally spaced nozzles may be provided in the base of each channel. The cover may have a conductive track corrected to wall-displacing electrodes, the points of connection being outside the channels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1609 (2013.01); B41J 2/14209 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01); B41J 2/1637 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01); B41J 2202/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919147 A1 19990422; AT 231073 T 20030215; AU 747616 B2 20020516; AU 9360898 A 19990503; BR 9812580 A 20020924; CA 2301819 A1 19990422; CA 2301819 C 20070724; CN 1146501 C 20040421; CN 1274316 A 20001122; DE 69810799 D1 20030220; DE 69810799 T2 20031023; DE 69833978 D1 20060518; DE 69833978 T2 20070125; EP 1021302 A1 20000726; EP 1021302 B1 20030115; EP 1241007 A1 20020918; EP 1241007 B1 20060329; ES 2186231 T3 20030501; ES 2257481 T3 20060801; GB 9721555 D0 19971210; IL 134657 A 20040104; IL 134657 D0 20010430; JP 2001519264 A 20011023; KR 100567262 B1 20060404; KR 20010031048 A 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833978

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121009

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121009

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101010

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101009

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257481 T3

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833978 P 20060518

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: XAAR TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

2006-03-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1021302 P

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040812

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1021302

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE