Global Patent Index - EP 1243083 A2

EP 1243083 A2 2002-09-25 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A TWO-DIRECTIONAL S 0? DATA STREAM FOR TRANSMISSION VIA A LOW VOLTAGE POWER NETWORK

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVERTING A TWO-DIRECTIONAL S 0? DATA STREAM FOR TRANSMISSION VIA A LOW VOLTAGE POWER NETWORK

Title (de)

UMSETZUNG EINES BIDIREKTIONALEN SO-DATENSTROMS FÜR EINE ÜBERMITTLUNG ÜBER EIN NIEDERSPANNUNGSSTROMNETZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONVERTIR UN FLUX DE DONNEES S 0? BIDIRECTIONNEL POUR UNE TRANSMISSION SUR UN RESEAU BASSE TENSION

Publication

EP 1243083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00991101 A

Priority

  • DE 0004541 W
  • DE 19963816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150625A2] The pseudoternary data stream is comprised of a sequence of SO frames (SR) and is converted into a binary data stream consisting of a sequence of binary frames (BR). First transmission packets provided for transmission of data in a first direction of transmission (DS) are subsequently modulated in a first frequency range ( DELTA f-DS) and second transmission packets provided for transmission of data in a second direction of transmission (US) are modulated in a second frequency range ( DELTA f-US). Finally, the binary frames (BR) are inserted in a first or second transmission packet and the first transmission packets are routed to a first transmission unit (UEE1) and the second transmission packets are routed to a second transmission unit (UEE2) for transfer via the low voltage power network (NSN).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 3/54; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/54 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/54 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0471 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5408 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5445 (2013.01); H04B 2203/545 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13034 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1308 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13202 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13209 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13291 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150625A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150625 A2 20010712; WO 0150625 A3 20020124; BR 0017053 A 20030107; DE 19963816 A1 20010719; DE 19963816 C2 20020926; EP 1243083 A2 20020925; US 2003090368 A1 20030515

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STOLLE, JOERG

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IDE, HANS-DIETER

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NEUHAUS, RALF

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE