Global Patent Index - EP 1243494 A1

EP 1243494 A1 2002-09-25 - Driven locking device of a door with reduced space requirement

Title (en)

Driven locking device of a door with reduced space requirement

Title (de)

Angetriebene Verriegelungsvorrichtung einer Tür mit verringertem Platzbedarf

Title (fr)

Dispositif motorisé de verrouillage de porte à encombrement réduit

Publication

EP 1243494 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290637 A

Priority

FR 0103689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2822185A1] The locking device comprises a motor with its axis (10) parallel to the longitudinal movement direction of the door leaf. A motor output (11) is connected to leaf longitudinal transmission means. The motor body (13) is rotated by the output. Leaf locking means (8) comprises a locking finger (18) and a longitudinal ramp. The motor body has its end directed towards the leaf in the closed position. A fixed arm extends parallel to the motor axis from the closed leaf side. A locking finger is fixed to the free end of the arm so that the finger is fixed at a distance from the motor body end (20).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif motorisé de verrouillage de porte (2) destinée en particulier à un véhicule ferroviaire, avec au moins un vantail (3) ; ledit dispositif comprenant : un moteur (9) à corps basculant, destiné à être monté sur le véhicule, l'axe (10) dudit moteur étant sensiblement parallèle à la direction longitudinale de déplacement dudit vantail (3), une sortie (11) dudit moteur étant reliée à des moyens de transmission longitudinale de mouvement au vantail, le corps (13) dudit moteur étant agencé pour être entraîné en rotation conjointe par la sortie (11) ou immobilisé en rotation par rapport à cette dernière, des moyens de verrouillage (8) du vantail en position fermée ou ouverte comprenant au moins un doigt de blocage (18, 18a) en position et une rampe sensiblement longitudinale, ledit doigt et la rampe étant solidaires respectivement du corps basculant et du vantail, caractérisé en ce que le corps (13) dudit moteur (9) présente à son extrémité dirigée vers le vantail en position fermée un bras fixe (21) s'étendant dans une direction sensiblement parallèle à l'axe (10) du moteur du côté dudit vantail en position fermée, au moins un doigt de blocage (18, 18a) étant solidaire de l'extrémité libre dudit bras (21), de sorte que ledit doigt de blocage (18, 18a) est fixé à distance de l'extrémité (20) du corps de moteur et que l'encombrement du dispositif est réduit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/02; E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2006.01); E05F 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2013.01); E05F 15/652 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/238 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/322 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1243494 A1 20020925; EP 1243494 B1 20050907; AT 303926 T 20050915; BR 0200860 A 20021210; CA 2376893 A1 20020919; CA 2376893 C 20060912; CN 1303305 C 20070307; CN 1375610 A 20021023; DE 60205969 D1 20051013; DE 60205969 T2 20060706; ES 2249543 T3 20060401; FR 2822185 A1 20020920; FR 2822185 B1 20030815; US 2002144625 A1 20021010; US 6679186 B2 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140313

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100313

2011-02-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FAIVELEY TRANSPORT

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-05-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060509

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249543 T3

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60205969 P 20051013

2005-10-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI