Global Patent Index - EP 1256422 A1

EP 1256422 A1 2002-11-13 - Working chamber with a remotely sealable opening for the insertion of a robot hand

Title (en)

Working chamber with a remotely sealable opening for the insertion of a robot hand

Title (de)

Arbeitskammer mit einer fernbetätigt abdichtbaren Durchführung für eine in die Arbeitskammer eingreifende Roboterhand

Title (fr)

Chambre de travail comprenant une ouverture étanchéifiable par télécommande pour l'introduction d'une main de robot

Publication

EP 1256422 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004905 A

Priority

  • DE 10120473 A
  • DE 10162780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002159868A1] A sealing device is provided for a working chamber system with a robot hand (216) that extends into the working chamber (100) through an aperture (120) by means of which a seal may be established and removed by remote control. The sealing device includes: (a) a flexible sealing element (20) by means of which an inner pass-through ring element (40) is connected with the edge of the aperture (120); (b) at least two coupling elements that are attached to the pass-through ring element (40) and (c) at least one locking element that is connected with the robot hand (216) and that may be positioned by means of positioning elements for coupling of the robot hand (216) with the pass-through ring element (40) by means of the coupling elements.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Arbeitskammersystem mit einer Roboterhand (216), die durch eine Ausnehmung (120) in die Arbeitskammer (100) eingreift, ist eine Abdichtungsvorrichtung vorgesehen, mittels der eine Abdichtung fernbetätigbar herzustellen und zu lösen ist. Die Abdichtungsvorrichtung umfasst: ein flexibles Dichtungselement (20), durch welches ein innenliegendes Durchführungsringelement (40) mit dem Rand der Ausnehmung (120) verbunden ist, wenigstens zwei Kupplungselemente, die an dem Durchführungsringelement (40) befestigt sind, und wenigstens ein Riegelelement, das mit der Roboterhand (216) verbunden ist und das mittels Stellelementen zur Kupplung der Roboterhand (216) mit dem Durchführungsringelement (40) in den Eingriff mit den Kupplungselementen zu bringen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25J 21/00; B25J 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/04 (2006.01); B24C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 9/00 (2013.01); B24C 3/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53096 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5879098 A 19990309 - DELEPINE JEAN [FR], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 196 (P - 1203) 21 May 1991 (1991-05-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20200702 U1 20020418; AT 372858 T 20070915; DE 10162780 C1 20021121; DE 50210867 D1 20071025; EP 1256422 A1 20021113; EP 1256422 B1 20070912; US 2002159868 A1 20021031; US 6732424 B2 20040511

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2012-11-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN, OLIVER, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-11-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WHEELABRATOR GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHLICK-ROTO-JET MASCHINENBAU GMBH, 48629 METELEN, DE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: DR. HOFFMEISTER & TARVENKORN, DE

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN, OLIVER, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: TARVENKORN & WICKORD PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120924

2012-09-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50210867

- Representative's name: DR. HOFFMEISTER & TARVENKORN, DE

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080305

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHLICK-ROTO-JET MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2008-04-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070912

2007-10-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210867 P 20071025

2007-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050502

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI