Global Patent Index - EP 1258130 A2

EP 1258130 A2 2002-11-20 - SIGNALLING OF A CALL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM BETWEEN A BASE STATION AND A MOBILE COMPONENT

Title (en)

SIGNALLING OF A CALL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM BETWEEN A BASE STATION AND A MOBILE COMPONENT

Title (de)

ANRUFSIGNALISIERUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZWISCHEN EINER BASISSTATION UND MEHREREN MOBILTEILEN

Title (fr)

SIGNALISATION D'APPEL DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS, ENTRE UNE STATION DE BASE ET UNE PARTIE MOBILE

Publication

EP 1258130 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01913575 A

Priority

  • DE 0100447 W
  • DE 10008241 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0163884A2] The invention relates to a base station to which especially more mobile components are allocated than the number of radio channels provided. The base station signals an incoming connection request to the mobile components in such a way that said station establishes a bidirectional connection to one of the mobile components after the connection request has been received, whereby the base station thus signals the incoming connection request and subsequently suppresses said request. This is sequentially repeated by means of at least one component of the mobile components. In addition, the base station can simultaneously establish a unidirectional connection to all mobile components and signal the incoming connection request immediately after the connection request has been received.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/725

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/72505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0163884A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0163884 A2 20010830; WO 0163884 A3 20020214; DE 10008241 A1 20010920; EP 1258130 A2 20021120; US 2003096615 A1 20030522

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECKERS, MICHAEL

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEERENS, HANS-GEORG

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIEDERMANN, ROLF

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LENFORT, CHRISTOPH

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMITZ, GEORG

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR