Global Patent Index - EP 1259955 A1

EP 1259955 A1 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING THE PHASE OF A QUASI-PERIODIC SIGNAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING THE PHASE OF A QUASI-PERIODIC SIGNAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHFÜHREN DER PHASE EINES FAST PERIODISCHEN SIGNALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER LA PHASE D'UN SIGNAL QUASI PERIODIQUE

Publication

EP 1259955 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912054 A

Priority

US 0005141 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0203381A1] A method for tracking the phase of a quasi-periodic signal includes he steps of estimating the phase of the signal for frames during which the signal is periodic, monitoring the performance of the estimated phase with a closed-loop performance measure, and measuring the phase of the signal for frames during which the signal is periodic and performance of the estimated phase falls below a predefined threshold level. In estimating the phase, the initial phase value is set equal to the estimated final phase value of the previous frame if the previous frame was periodic. The initial phase value is set equal to a measured phase value of the previous frame if the previous frame was nonperiodic, or if the previous frame was periodic and performance of the estimated phase for the previous frame fell below the predefined threshold level. For frames during which the signal is nonperiodic, the phase of the signal is measured. An open-loop periodicity decision can be used to determine whether the signal is periodic for a given frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/02 (2013.01); G10L 25/48 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/48 (2013.01); G10L 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0203381A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0203381 A1 20020110; AU 3385200 A 20020114; CN 1262991 C 20060705; CN 1437746 A 20030820; DE 60025471 D1 20060406; DE 60025471 T2 20060824; EP 1259955 A1 20021127; EP 1259955 B1 20060111; HK 1055834 A1 20070209; JP 2004502203 A 20040122; JP 4567289 B2 20101020

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254155 T3

2006-06-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025471 P 20060406

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-03-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060311

2006-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI