Global Patent Index - EP 1260640 A1

EP 1260640 A1 2002-11-27 - Leaching unit

Title (en)

Leaching unit

Title (de)

Rigoleneinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'infiltration

Publication

EP 1260640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010482 A

Priority

DE 10123754 A

Abstract (en)

The drainage trench unit (100) is in the shape of a hollow body, with a base (120) and a number of vertical connecting walls (124) on it. At least part of the walls is permeable to liquid, and the walls define volume zones. An inspection channel (130) is parallel to the base, extending over a major part of the drainage trench height, with open longitudinal ends (130a). The inspection channel is defined by at least two connecting walls. The base (104b) of the inspection channel shrouds the trench base, with a gap (d) between them formed by at least one reinforcement rib (116). The components of the trench unit are injection molded.

The drainage trench unit (100) is in the shape of a hollow body, with a base (120) and a number of vertical connecting walls (124) on it. At least part of the walls is permeable to liquid, and the walls define volume zones. An inspection channel (130) is parallel to the base, extending over a major part of the drainage trench height, with open longitudinal ends (130a). The inspection channel is defined by at least two connecting walls. The base (104b) of the inspection channel shrouds the trench base, with a gap (d) between them formed by at least one reinforcement rib (116). The components of the trench unit are injection molded.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rigoleneinheit (100), welche im Wesentlichen als Hohlkörper ausgebildet ist und eine Basiswandung (120) umfasst, sowie eine Mehrzahl von Verbindungswandungen (124), welche von der Basiswandung (120) abstehen, wobei zumindest ein Teil dieser Wandungen für Flüssigkeit durchlässig ausgebildet ist, und wobei weiter diese Wandungen wenigstens ein Flüssigkeitsaufnahmevolumen begrenzen. Erfindungsgemäß weist sie ferner wenigstens einen Inspektionskanal (130) auf, welcher zur Basiswandung (120) im Wesentlichen parallel verläuft, sich über einen großen Teil der Höhe der Rigoleneinheit (100) erstreckt, und an seinen beiden Längsenden (130a) offen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00; E02B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/00 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/005 (2013.01); E03F 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260640 A1 20021127; EP 1260640 B1 20060405; EP 1260640 B2 20120912; AT 322587 T 20060415; DE 10123754 A1 20021205; DE 50206282 D1 20060518; DK 1260640 T3 20060814; DK 1260640 T4 20130114; EP 1666668 A2 20060607; EP 1666668 A3 20150107

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-14 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2012-10-31 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50206282

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-09-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20120912

2012-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060508

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANKISCHE ROHRWERKE GEBR. KIRCHNER G.M.B.H. & CO

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HAURATON GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WAVIN B.V.

- Effective date: 20070104

2007-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HAURATON GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-09-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-07-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060619

2006-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206282 P 20060518

2006-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030512

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI